+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.498
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.395
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor