+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.68
- Signed Chap.678
On December 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1672
- Substituted For S7075
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.107
- Rules Report Cal.107
- Reported
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
June 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor