+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5105c
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.517
- Rules Report Cal.517
- Reported
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 350c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Rules
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 350b
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 350a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor