+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.110
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S2181
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.250
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 2, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor