+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.469
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.251
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary