+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.430
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5932
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.86
- Rules Report Cal.86
- Reported
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Vote
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor