+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.393
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 3391a
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.139
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor