+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
On December 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed Memo.306
On December 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4402a
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.641
- Rules Report Cal.641
- Reported
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3390a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Labor
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
June 24, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor