+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
- Recommitted To Correction
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 3366b
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 3366a
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.124
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.112
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor