+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.803
On December 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.904
- Substituted For S2966a
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.68
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.68
- Delivered To Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 336a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor