+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 336a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor