+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.264
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.406
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor