+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.58
- Signed Chap.658
On November 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1619
- Substituted For S924
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.106
- Rules Report Cal.106
- Reported
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Vote
June 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor