+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held for consideration in codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 3304c
- Amend and recommit to codes
On March 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amend and recommit to codes
- Amend and recommit to codes
- Print number 3304b
- Amend and recommit to codes
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 3304a
- Print number 3304a
- Amend and recommit to codes
On January 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes