+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Held For Consideration In Codes
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor