+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 3246b
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.260
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.94
- Rules Report Cal.94
- Reported
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3246a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On January 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor