+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 25, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2271
On March 21, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.366
On March 19, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On February 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary