+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.428
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4523a
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.84
- Rules Report Cal.84
- Reported
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 3208a
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1