+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.308
- Rules Report Cal.308
- Reported
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 320a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor