+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s4323
- Substituted by s4323
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.620
- Rules report cal.620
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 3182a
- Amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
On January 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor