+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.93
- Rules Report Cal.93
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3136a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Employees
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On January 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor