+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3096b
- Amend And Recommit To Correction
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On October 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3096a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Correction
On January 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor