+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 26, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 8, 2024 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On February 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor