+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5216a
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.330
- Rules Report Cal.330
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3072a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health