+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 3057b
- Amend and recommit to small business
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to small business
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 3057a
- Amend and recommit to small business
On January 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to small business
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor