+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.138
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.356
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor