+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 3048c
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.245
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 3048b
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.331
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3048a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes