+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.180
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor