+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.24
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.46
- Rules Report Cal.46
- Reported
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging