+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 2962b
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.135
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 2962a
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.190
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes