+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.431
On October 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
- Delivered to governor
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.674
- Substituted for s1740a
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading (t) 2929a
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.37
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to housing
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor