+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.236
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.400
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor