+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5627
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.399
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor