+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5621b
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Recommitted To Investigations And Government Operations
- Substitution Reconsidered
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2873b
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Cal.764
- Substituted For S5621a
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Rules Report Cal.107
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.107
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On March 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2873a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On January 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor