+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.42
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.199
- Substituted For S3760
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Racing, Gaming And Wagering
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.275
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Racing And Wagering
+ − Vote
June 8, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor