+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.274
On November 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1849
- Substituted For S6855a
- Committed To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 2804a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
- Recalled From Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.223
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.273
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Small Business
+ − Vote
June 18, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor