+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.80
- Rules Report Cal.80
- Reported
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor