+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.128
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.332
- Rules Report Cal.332
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 2781a
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor