+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4990a
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.250
- Rules Report Cal.250
- Reported
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2766a
- Amend And Recommit To Children And Families
On January 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor