+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2736c
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2736b
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2736a
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor