+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.125
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.78
- Rules Report Cal.78
- Reported
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations