+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s612
On May 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.797
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
On January 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor