+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2709c
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2709b
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Held For Consideration In Transportation
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2709a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor