+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to energy
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to energy
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor