+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 2699a
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.123
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.77
- Rules Report Cal.77
- Reported
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor