+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2558
- Ruling Of Chair On Point Of Order
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.107
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation