+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2938a
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.244
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor