+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.445
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1747
- Substituted For S6492
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.85
- Rules Report Cal.85
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 10, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor