+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.138
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.18
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor