+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 2562a
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.137
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.17
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health